skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 10:27:10 AM

Hussey, Andrew Alford

CPSO#: 29422

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
378 Huron St
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone: (519) 271-7900
Fax: (519) 271-2830 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew A. Hussey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussey ( CPSO# 29422 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 271-7900

Business Address:
A-378 Huron St
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone Number: 519271 7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW ALFORD HUSSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977