THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:41:51 AM
KAFKA, HENRYK Peter
CPSO#:
29419
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko Authority Health Area
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 34
Moose Factory ON P2L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544 Ext. 2366
Fax: (705) 688-4738
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HENRYK PETER KAFKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAFKA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1977 |