THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:50:24 AM
Wright, Frederick Forbes
CPSO#:
29398
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Frederick Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: June 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDING OF GUILT
Frederick Forbes Wright was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Care or control of a motor vehicle with over 80mg blood alcohol, contrary to Section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: December 19, 2018
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1500.