THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:37:54 PM
Kumar, Brinda Cauhalagala Prasanna
CPSO#:
29373
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Mysore University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 401
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview, ON M3H 3S3
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Oct 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Feb 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2015 |