THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:52:46 PM
Clement, John Stuart
CPSO#:
29333
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. S. Clement Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Parkwood Institute, 550 Wellington Rd.,London, Ontario, N6C 5J1
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |