skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/09/21 9:06:21 AM

Trickey, Brian Hazen

CPSO#: 29328

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 Princess St.
Kingston ON  K7M 1A9
Phone: (613) 766-0318
Fax: (613) 766 0339 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 Sutherland Drive
Kingston ON  K7K5V6
Canada
Phone: (613) 766 0318
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Trickey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 01 Jun 2011


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN HAZEN TRICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRICKEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2018