THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:05:02 PM
Lang, Peter Joseph
CPSO#:
29243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20 Sunbridge Cres
Kitchener ON N2K 1T3
Phone: (519) 570-4572
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. J. Lang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH LANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2005 |