skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 17:10:05 PM

Paulseth, John Erik

CPSO#: 29218

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Erik Paulseth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Records Management Ltd. 1.800.775.0093
 [email protected] 
1 High Meadow Pl, UNit 13
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 29 Jun 2020


Instructions/Address:

Contact above
Records Management Ltd.
1.800.775.0093
[email protected]
1 High Meadow Pl, UNit 13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 21 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020