THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:34:13 PM
McMullen, William John Michael Mary
CPSO#:
29162
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Sudbury ON P3E 3B5
Phone: (705) 674-3181 Ext. 4700
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: William McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:20 Sep 1991 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN MICHAEL MARY MCMULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1977 |