skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 20:05:46 PM

Ciurria, Nicholas Samuel

CPSO#: 29153

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Danforth Medical Centre
1473 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N5
Phone: (416) 461-0785
Fax: (416) 461-0787 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2754 Victoria Park Avenue
North York ON  M2J 4A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-3910
Fax: (416) 491-3919
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Ciurria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ciurria ( CPSO# 29153 )

Business Address:
Danforth Medical Centre
1473 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 461-0785

Business Address:
2754 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M2J 4A8
Phone Number: (416) 491-3910

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SAMUEL CIURRIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIURRIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2022