THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:13:36 PM
Chen, Hing Kai
CPSO#:
29149
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Hing Kai Chen undertakes to resign effective December 14, 2008, and not to apply or re-apply as a physician or for a license to prastise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.