THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:51:28 AM
Findlater, Andrew Ross
CPSO#:
29114
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Community Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 1996 |