THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:58:58 PM
Bocking, John Kenneth
CPSO#:
29009
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Mar 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. John Kenneth Bocking Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2010 |