THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:42:34 AM
Pokrupa, Ronald Peter
CPSO#:
28994
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ronald P. Pokrupa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:07 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Oct 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2021 |