THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:10:05 AM
Ibey, Margaret Mary
CPSO#:
28976
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
20 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Mar 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Margaret Ibey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:101-60 Bowes St
Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Date Received: 20 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2018 |