THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:38:11 PM
Manigat, Claude Charles
CPSO#:
28892
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Dec 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French
Education: University of Haiti, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Claude Manigat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management 13-1 High Meadow PI Toronto Ontario M9L O A3
toll free 1-800-775-0093
Fax 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 Dec 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |