skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 5:25:13 AM

Fisman, Michael Zed

CPSO#: 28813

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Oct 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sandra N. Fisman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fisman ( CPSO# 28813 )
Dr. S. Fisman ( CPSO# 30365 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
H5 - 550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6671

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
B8-150
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6671

Medical Records Location

Address: Parkwood Institute for Mental Health 550 Wellington Road London ON N6C 0A7
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 2018