skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 18:05:07 PM

Maraj, Ramsarran

CPSO#: 28810

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#103-210 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5G8
Phone: (613) 962-5966
Fax: (613) 962-5230 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ramsarran Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maraj ( CPSO# 28810 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
210 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5G8
Phone Number: (613) 962-5966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 26 Oct 2020 Active
 As from April 25, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions
and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ramsarran Maraj,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mraj to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. RAMSARRAN MARAJ
                                          ("Dr. Maraj")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
A.    PREAMBLE

(1)   In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
the College;
                  
"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
 System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.
                  
(2)   I, Dr. Maraj, certificate of registration number 28810, am a member of
the College.

(3)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that following a report that raised concerns
about my standard of practice in family medicine, I underwent remediation
and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report
subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of
practice in family medicine in file number 338563.

B.    UNDERTAKING

(4)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5)   Clinical Supervision

(a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").

(b)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
 Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
 Appendix "B";
                  
(ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
recommendations;
                  
(iii) After the initial meeting described at section 5(b)(ii), meet
 with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved
 by the College, biweekly for six (6) meetings, then monthly
 for nine (9) meetings;
                  
(iv)  After the initial meeting described at section 5(b)(ii) and
during the Clinical Supervisor's first two (2) bi-weekly
meetings, perform direct observation of my patient encounters
for two (2) half-days;

(v)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
 visit;
                  
(vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
(vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
ongoing professional development and inquire into my
compliance with the recommendations;

(viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
Supervision; and
                  
(ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
 month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
the areas of concern identified in the reports of the assessor
dated August 28, 2018 and November 11, 2018, and concerns that may
arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
professional development.
                  
(e)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
 Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
 (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
(f)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that if a person who has given an
undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
College within that time.
                  
(g)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
(f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

 (h)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
 as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
 condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
 term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
register.
                  
 (6)   Professional Education

(a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
including all of the following professional education (the
"Professional Education"):
                  
(i)   a review and written summary of the following policies and
guidelines:
                  
1.    Canadian ADHD Resource Alliance - Canadian ADHD
 Practice Guidelines
                  
2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
Non-Cancer Pain - Recommendations related to urine drug
screening

3.    College Policy: Medical Records; and
                  
(ii)  review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor the following
resources:
                  
1.    Choosing Wisely Canada - recommendations for family
physicians;

2.    Tools to evaluate pediatric development, e.g. Rourke
baby growth chart;
                  
3.    Tools to evaluate suicidal ideation, e.g. PDQ-9, GAD or
 Beck; and
                  
(iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
Clinical Supervisor.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to complete this requirement by August 30,
2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
the first possible opportunity thereafter.  I acknowledge that the
College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
Professional Education.
                  
(7)   Reassessment of Practice

(a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
 assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
 I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
 direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
 co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
 necessary by the College.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
 conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
(d)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
may form the basis of further action by the College.

(8)   Monitoring

(a)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
that location.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Maraj, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
(c)   I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(d)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
respectively. 
                  
C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(11)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(12)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14)  I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15)  Public Register

 (a)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
 Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
 the Public Register.
                  
(b)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
 being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
Following a report that raised concerns about Dr. Maraj's
standard of practice in family medicine, he underwent
remediation and a reassessment. The reassessment report
received by the College raised concerns about his standard of                              
practice in family medicine. As a result of the reassessment:
                  
Dr. Maraj will practise under the guidance of a
Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Maraj will engage in professional education in
medical recordkeeping, opioid prescribing and with
respect to several clinical guidelines and tools.
                  
Dr. Maraj's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
selected by the College approximately six (6) months
after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                 
(c)   I, Dr. Maraj, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
D.    CONSENT

(16)  I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
following information to any person who requires this information for the
purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
entering into this Undertaking;
                  
(b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
 of, my practice; and

(c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
this Undertaking.
                  
(17)  I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)  I, Dr. Maraj, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
and to one another, any of the following:

(a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
(b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
Undertaking;
                  
(c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
(d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 15, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: April 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ramsarran Maraj to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2019:

Following a report that raised concerns about Dr. Maraj’s standard of practice in family medicine, he underwent remediation and a reassessment. The reassessment report received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Maraj will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Maraj will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, opioid prescribing and with respect to several clinical guidelines and tools.

Dr. Maraj’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six (6) months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 12, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 26, 2019, Dr. Maraj has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)