THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:31:11 AM
Kidy, Abdul Razak
CPSO#:
28794
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Welsh National School of Medicine, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kidy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Prism Eye Institute
605-7700 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L6Y 4M3
Date Received: 06 May 2019
Instructions/Address:Manager
Prism Eye Institute
7700 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L6Y 4M3
Phone: 905-456-3937
Fax: 905-459-5085
Date Received: 02 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |