THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 12:01:02 PM
Dakin, Edward Bolton
CPSO#:
28763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889-1125
Fax: 905 889-4216
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 10 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 May 2007 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 17 May 2007 |
|
Active |