THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 12:15:26 PM
Ianni, Frank Aldo
CPSO#:
28754
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Sep 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Frank Ianni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain their medical record from Dr. Ianni's general practice may contact:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5.
Patients looking to obtain their medical record from Dr. Ianni's care of the elderly practice may contact:
Algoma Geriatric Clinic
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 0A8
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |