THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:56:34 AM
Trusdale, Terry Niall Weston
CPSO#:
28736
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Terry Trusdale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRY NIALL WESTON TRUSDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUSDALE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1976 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 22, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Thunder Bay, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Trusdale in respect of an incident that took place in April 2008.