skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 9:38:57 AM

Doyle, William Leo

CPSO#: 28722

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William L. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: C/O Dr. Vornberger 481 London Rd. Sarnia, ON N7T 4X3
Date Received: 02 Jul 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2020