THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:08:30 AM
Smith, Gregory Lewis George
CPSO#:
28714
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1976 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Dec 2007
Summary:
On December 17, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Smith committed acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise, and that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by m embers as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee directed the following:
1) That the Registrar to suspend Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration for a period of five (5) months, effective January 1, 2008, the last month to be suspended if Dr. Smith successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course within four (4) months of the date of this Order, and provides proof thereof to the College;
2) That Dr. Smith(s OHIP billings be monitored by a licensed physician, acceptable to the College and at Dr. Smith(s expense, for the next two (2) years, commencing on the date the suspension outlined in paragraph 3 ends. The monitoring shall take place monthly for the first year and bimonthly for the second year. The monitor shall report to the College on a quarterly basis or sooner if his/her review has detected items of concern.
3) That Dr. Smith to pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
4) That the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 17, 2007