skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/07/22 4:21:11 AM

Stelzer, Hans Jurgen

CPSO#: 28626

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Apr 2022
EXPIRY DATE
28 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. J. Stelzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 28 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Medical records available by e-mail:  [email protected]
Date Received: 27 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 2022