THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 20:15:00 PM
Hollingworth, James Leslie
CPSO#:
28598
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jim Hollingworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Storage & Retreival Services
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel : 416-398-0638
Date Received: 22 Apr 2015
Instructions/Address:Please submit an online request through the website or contact RSRS Support at the phone number provided.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
Website: www.GetMyMedRecord.ca
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |