THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:51:55 AM
Qureshy, Bushra
CPSO#:
28561
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
8-Apr-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Albany Medical Clinic, 807 Broadview Avenue, Toronto, ON, M4K 2P8
Date Received: 23 Aug 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Qureshy voluntarily resigned from the College, effective May 31, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.