THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:21:28 AM
Kocandrle, Karel Petr
CPSO#:
28535
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Italian
Education: Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
11163 - 6th line
Acton ON L7J 2L7
Phone: (905) 878-0148
Fax: 905 8780148
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Apr 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREL PETR KOCANDRLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCANDRLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Mar 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1978 |