skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 21:08:53 PM

Cherry, Paul Martin Hempsall

CPSO#: 28474

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at 111 St. Regis Crescent S., Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-888-563-3732 (phone), 416-398-5932 (fax)
Date Received: 06 Nov 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020