THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:17:08 AM
Costa, Maria Teresa De Jesus
CPSO#:
28463
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:06 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Mar 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1998 |