skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 9:20:59 AM

Finlayson, Judith Elizabeth

CPSO#: 28434

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 May 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: RSRS www.GetMyMedRecord.ca or Phone: 1-888-563-3732 Ext 1
Date Received: 19 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 16 Jun 1975 to 13 Jun 1976
Other - Rotating Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 31 Dec 1976
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 10 Jan 1977 to 04 Jul 1977
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2021