THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:10:56 PM
Mistry, Yasmin
CPSO#:
28417
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Thobani, Yasmin (used until: 11 Sep 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R Y Mistry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2024
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr Hadid,
B- 796 Burnhamthorpe Road W
Mississauga ON
L5C 2R9
Date Received: 10 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2021 |