skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 3:19:09 AM

Bell, Robert Stuart

CPSO#: 28391

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
03 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Paitents should contact:
Health Record Services
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 Univeristy Ave
Floor 3b Rm 202
Toronto ON M5G 2M9

or

Tel: 416-946-4501 ext 4711
Date Received: 18 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 May 2021