THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:02:55 AM
Macintyre, John Dugald
CPSO#:
28362
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Macintyre, John Douglas (used until: 03 Nov 1983 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John D. MacIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Parkside Medical Clinic
15B-115 Hamilton St N
Waterdown ON L8B 1A8
Date Received: 01 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |