THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:32:24 AM
Lee, Lap Cheung
CPSO#:
28285
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Hakka, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7335 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 2B2
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lap Cheung Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2023 |