THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 12:50:24 PM
Saffer, Mark David
CPSO#:
28170
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
438 University Ave #200
Toronto ON M5G 2K8
Phone: 905 762 0525
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2001 |