skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 1:51:47 AM

Navarro, Margaret Elizabeth

CPSO#: 28157

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 May 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ruiz-Navarro, Margaret Elizabeth (used until: 26 Oct 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. & M. Navarro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Records Access Services Canada Inc
854 Upper Canada Drive
Sarnia ON  N7W 1A4
1 800 971 8038
Date Received: 11 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 2018