THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:02:29 AM
Wolder, Thomas
CPSO#:
28147
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Wolder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
RSRS
111 St Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Nov 2020 |