THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:42:29 AM
Seguin, Joseph Wilfrid Dennis
CPSO#:
28143
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
11 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Dec 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dennis Seguin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Dr. Weal Guirguis for medical record inquiries.
Suite 202
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga, ON L5M 4N4
Tel: 905 820 5102
Date Received: 11 Sep 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Sep 2015 |