skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 15:01:57 PM

Clark, William Foster

CPSO#: 28129

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.F. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
London, ON 
N6A 5W9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022