THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:31:32 PM
Fiser, Jarmila Emilia
CPSO#:
28104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Shiff, Jarmila Emilia (used until: 02 Jul 1986 )
Fiser-Shiff, Jarmila Emilia (used until: 20 Dec 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: University of Comenius, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 33408
Fax: (905) 721-4757
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JARMILA EMILIA FISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1983 |