THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:42:37 AM
Thomas, Anthony Dorrien
CPSO#:
28057
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Sep 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 4
54 Auburn Street
Peterborough, ON K9H 2G2
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Feb 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |