THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:20:36 PM
Davies, Ross Andrew
CPSO#:
28017
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst.
Room 1295-C
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7321
Fax: (613) 696-7138
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ross A. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 11 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSS ANDREW DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Nov 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1979 |