THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:09:43 AM
Mahoney, James Leo
CPSO#:
27917
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Phone #: 1-888-563-3732
SRS
111 Saint Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2021 |