THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:30:32 AM
McNiece, Lynne Carole
CPSO#:
27906
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-Sep-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2016 |