skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/07/20 6:58:26 AM

Kirby, Erle John

CPSO#: 27871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERLE JOHN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985