THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:25:47 PM
Robson, Michael
CPSO#:
27835
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:6668 3rd Line
Tottenham ON L0G 1W0
Date Received: 29 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |