THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/03/24 7:03:30 AM
Campbell, Doreen Joyce
CPSO#:
27834
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 807
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 408-1010
Fax: (416) 408-2828
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:04 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOREEN JOYCE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1975 |