THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:18:43 AM
Ahuja, Jan
CPSO#:
27809
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
1220 Place d'Orleans
Orléans ON K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: (613) 841-5393
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jan Ahuja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:26 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAN AHUJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHUJA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Nov 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1978 |