THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:18:47 AM
Ruddock, David Graham Strickland
CPSO#:
27792
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:149 Ena Drive
Huntsville, Ontario
P1H 2J4
Date Received: 31 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |